NJ A2873 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1180
Note: Carry Over of previous A2070
Note: Carry Over of previous A2070
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S2485 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S2485 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires school districts to offer course in computer science and DOE to adopt changes to NJ Student Learning Standards in computer science.*
Title
Requires school districts to offer course in computer science and DOE to adopt changes to NJ Student Learning Standards in computer science.*
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Jones [D] | Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Rep. Reed Gusciora [D] |
Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] | Rep. Angelica Jimenez [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Substituted by S2485 (2R) |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Muoio) |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Jones) |
2016-06-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2873 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S2485 (2R)
A2070 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S2485 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (66-1-2)
A2070 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S2485 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (66-1-2)