NJ A2863 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-13 - Senate Amendment (25-0) (Sarlo)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-13 - Senate Amendment (25-0) (Sarlo)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain workers subject to prevailing wage requirements to be enrolled in, or have completed, registered apprenticeship.
Title
Requires certain workers subject to prevailing wage requirements to be enrolled in, or have completed, registered apprenticeship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate Amendment (25-0) (Sarlo) |
2016-10-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2016-09-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (69-2-2) |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2173 (Same As) 2017-02-13 - Senate Amendment (27-0) (Sarlo)