NJ A2839 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A670
Note: Carry Over of previous S1341
Note: Carry Over of previous S1341
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires death certificates to include drug responsible for drug overdose death under certain circumstances.
Title
Requires death certificates to include drug responsible for drug overdose death under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A670 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S1341 (Carry Over) 2022-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S2663 (Same As) 2024-02-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S1341 (Carry Over) 2022-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S2663 (Same As) 2024-02-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A2839 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A3000/2839_I1.HTM |