NJ A2835 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1969
Note: Carry Foward to future S2208
Note: Carry Over of previous A1074
Note: Carry Over of previous S693
Note: Carry Foward to future S2208
Note: Carry Over of previous A1074
Note: Carry Over of previous S693
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Secretary of Higher Education to create and maintain database of Educational Opportunity Fund student admissions.
Title
Requires Secretary of Higher Education to create and maintain database of Educational Opportunity Fund student admissions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2835 (Carry Over) 2022-02-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A2835 (Carry Over) 2022-02-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S1664 (Same As) 2022-02-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A1074 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S693 (Carry Over) 2020-06-25 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A2835 (Carry Over) 2022-02-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S1664 (Same As) 2022-02-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A1074 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S693 (Carry Over) 2020-06-25 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A2835 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A3000/2835_I1.HTM |