NJ A2814 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2655
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-23 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Pending: Senate Higher Eduction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-23 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Pending: Senate Higher Eduction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs Secretary of Higher Education to revoke proprietary school's license to award academic degrees if school fails to achieve certain minimum graduation rates.
Title
Directs Secretary of Higher Education to revoke proprietary school's license to award academic degrees if school fails to achieve certain minimum graduation rates.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Cryan [D] | Sen. John Burzichelli [D] | Rep. Celeste Riley [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] |
Rep. Eliana Marin [D] | Rep. Carmelo Garcia [D] | Rep. Gilbert Wilson [D] | Sen. Paul Moriarty [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-10-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 14 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-16 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 14 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-16 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 14 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
2014-10-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (47-14-16) |
2014-10-02 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-03-24 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2814 (Carry Over) 2014-10-23 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
S2532 (Same As) 2014-10-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
S2532 (Same As) 2014-10-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee