NJ A2805 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4278
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Approved P.L.2017, c.78.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Approved P.L.2017, c.78.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DMVA to develop online historic tour identifying locations of war battles and places of significance to war efforts in State.
Title
Requires DMVA to develop online historic tour identifying locations of war battles and places of significance to war efforts in State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2726 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-06 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-06 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Senate | Approved P.L.2017, c.78. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Substituted for S2726 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-11-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2016-10-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (70-0-0) |
2016-10-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4278 (Carry Over) 2015-05-18 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S2726 (Same As) 2017-03-13 - Substituted by A2805
S2726 (Same As) 2017-03-13 - Substituted by A2805