NJ A2798 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1842
Note: Carry Foward to future S1979
Note: Carry Foward to future S1979
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-02 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-02 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes certain income earned from health promotion or disease prevention work from income eligibility determination under NJ FamilyCare, WFNJ, and NJ SNAP.
Title
Excludes certain income earned from health promotion or disease prevention work from income eligibility determination under NJ FamilyCare, WFNJ, and NJ SNAP.
Sponsors
Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Shanique Speight [D] |
Rep. Angelica Jimenez [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-1-0) |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Human Services Committee |
2022-03-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-03-07 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Health Committee |
2022-02-28 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2798 (Carry Over) 2022-06-02 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A2798 (Carry Over) 2022-06-02 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S4203 (Same As) 2023-12-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A2798 (Carry Over) 2022-06-02 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S4203 (Same As) 2023-12-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee