NJ A2795 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A983
Note: Carry Foward to future S2293
Note: Carry Over of previous A1883
Note: Carry Over of previous S2215
Note: Carry Foward to future S2293
Note: Carry Over of previous A1883
Note: Carry Over of previous S2215
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-08 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Criminalizes certain actions of individuals who offer rental of residential property that they do not own or legally possess.
Title
Criminalizes certain actions of individuals who offer rental of residential property that they do not own or legally possess.
Sponsors
Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] | Rep. Anthony Verrelli [D] | Rep. Ralph Caputo [D] | Rep. Shanique Speight [D] |
Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Sen. Britnee Timberlake [D] | Rep. William Spearman [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2795 (Carry Over) 2021-03-08 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A2795 (Carry Over) 2021-03-08 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S1321 (Same As) 2020-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A1883 (Carry Over) 2018-06-11 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S2215 (Carry Over) 2018-03-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A2795 (Carry Over) 2021-03-08 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S1321 (Same As) 2020-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A1883 (Carry Over) 2018-06-11 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S2215 (Carry Over) 2018-03-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee