NJ A2747 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Approved P.L.2018, c.98.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Limits time continuing care retirement communities may retain refundable entrance fee after resident vacates facility; provides for disposition of certain personal property.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limits time continuing care retirement communities may retain refundable entrance fee after resident vacates facility; provides for disposition of certain personal property.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1532 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-17SenateApproved P.L.2018, c.98.
2018-07-01SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0)
2018-07-01SenateSubstituted for S1532 (1R)
2018-06-29SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2018-06-30AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (74-0-0)
2018-06-25AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
2018-06-07AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Tully)
2018-04-12AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Houghtaling)
2018-03-05AssemblyReported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2018-02-01AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1532 (Same As) 2018-07-01 - Substituted by A2747/880 (ACS/3R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback