NJ A2722 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A4074

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-12-07 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires Commissioner of Corrections to institute 30-minute shift overlap in State correctional facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires Commissioner of Corrections to institute 30-minute shift overlap in State correctional facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-07AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-02-13AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1862 (Same As) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A4074 (Carry Over) 2018-06-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback