NJ A2719 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3025
Note: Carry Over of previous A4129
Note: Carry Over of previous A4129
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-30 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-30 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "New Jersey Business Advisory Council" in Business Action Center.
Title
Establishes "New Jersey Business Advisory Council" in Business Action Center.
Sponsors
Sen. Anthony M. Bucco [R] | Rep. Nancy Munoz [R] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] |
Rep. BettyLou DeCroce [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-30 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2719 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A4129 (Carry Over) 2015-12-10 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S959 (Same As) 2016-02-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A4129 (Carry Over) 2015-12-10 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S959 (Same As) 2016-02-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee