NJ A2717 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A888
Note: Carry Over of previous S522
Note: Carry Over of previous S522
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-9)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-26 - Motion To Table (41-28-0) (Greenwald)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-09-26 - Motion To Table (41-28-0) (Greenwald)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes proportional property tax exemption for honorably discharged veterans having a service-connected permanent disability and proclaims that the State shall reimburse municipalities for costs of exemption.
Title
Authorizes proportional property tax exemption for honorably discharged veterans having a service-connected permanent disability and proclaims that the State shall reimburse municipalities for costs of exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-09-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 41 N: 28 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-26 | Assembly | Motion To Table (41-28-0) (Greenwald) |
2024-09-26 | Assembly | Motion Relieve from Committee (Bergen) |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A888 (Carry Over) 2023-05-25 - Motion To Table Motion(42-30-0)(Greenwald)
S522 (Carry Over) 2022-05-09 - Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S58 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S522 (Carry Over) 2022-05-09 - Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S58 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A2717 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A3000/2717_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A2717 |