NJ A2636 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Substituted by S2527 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Concerns online marketing of affordable housing units.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerns online marketing of affordable housing units.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29AssemblySubstituted by S2527 (1R)
2020-06-25AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-06-22AssemblyRecommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-03-05AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-02-13AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2527 (Same As) 2020-07-01 - Approved P.L.2020, c.51.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback