NJ A2635 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1547
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-06 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-06 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires motor vehicle dealers provide loan application to consumers.
Title
Requires motor vehicle dealers provide loan application to consumers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 14 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 14 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (55-14-0) |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2635 (Carry Over) 2021-12-06 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S3843 (Same As) 2021-12-06 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S3843 (Same As) 2021-12-06 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading