NJ A2609 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5800
Note: Carry Over of previous S4163
Note: Carry Over of previous S4163
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2025-02-27 - Substituted by S742
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2025-02-27 - Substituted by S742
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates unexpended funds from "New Jersey Bridge Rehabilitation and Improvement and Railroad Right-of-way Preservation Bond Act of 1989."
Title
Appropriates unexpended funds from "New Jersey Bridge Rehabilitation and Improvement and Railroad Right-of-way Preservation Bond Act of 1989."
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Karabinchak [D] | Rep. Linda Carter [D] | Rep. Christopher DePhillips [R] | Rep. Clinton Calabrese [D] |
Roll Calls
2025-02-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-09-19 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-09-19 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-02-27 | Assembly | Substituted by S742 |
2025-02-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-09-19 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5800 (Carry Over) 2023-12-14 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S4163 (Carry Over) 2023-12-21 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S742 (Same As) 2025-02-27 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-0-0)
S4163 (Carry Over) 2023-12-21 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S742 (Same As) 2025-02-27 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-0-0)