NJ A2604 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A2674

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Engrossed on November 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes "Blue Alert System."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes "Blue Alert System."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-25AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (74-0-0)
2019-02-25AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
2018-12-03AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-01AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2674 (Carry Over) 2016-06-06 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S3272 (Same As) 2019-02-14 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback