NJ A2601 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2601
Note: Carry Over of previous A218
Note: Carry Over of previous A218
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires motor vehicle inspection stickers to notify drivers of penalty for texting while driving.
Title
Requires motor vehicle inspection stickers to notify drivers of penalty for texting while driving.
Sponsors
Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] |
Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-11-26 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-1) |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2601 (Carry Over) 2019-02-14 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A218 (Carry Over) 2016-12-12 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S2811 (Same As) 2019-02-14 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A218 (Carry Over) 2016-12-12 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S2811 (Same As) 2019-02-14 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee