NJ A2598 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2943
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-07 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-07 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises certain aspects of the New Jersey Individual Development Account Program.*
Title
Revises certain aspects of the New Jersey Individual Development Account Program.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-18 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-18 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
2015-12-03 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (44-16-4) |
2015-01-29 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (DeAngelo) |
2014-09-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2598 (Carry Over) 2015-12-07 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S3139 (Same As) 2015-08-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S3139 (Same As) 2015-08-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee