NJ A2584 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-31 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-31 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DEP to allow for correction of technical and administrative permit application violations; and subjects adoption of DEP technical manuals to Administrative Procedure Act." *
Title
Requires DEP to allow for correction of technical and administrative permit application violations; and subjects adoption of DEP technical manuals to Administrative Procedure Act." *
Sponsors
Rep. Ruben Ramos [D] | Rep. Ralph Caputo [D] | Rep. John Amodeo [R] | Sen. John Burzichelli [D] |
Sen. Paul Moriarty [D] | Rep. Gilbert Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
2012-05-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-1-0) |
2012-03-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulatory Oversight and Gaming Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2025 (Same As) 2012-05-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee