NJ A2574 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4918
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-21 - Approved P.L.2016, c.65.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-21 - Approved P.L.2016, c.65.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies stadiums and arenas owned by local government entities are exempt from property taxation.
Title
Clarifies stadiums and arenas owned by local government entities are exempt from property taxation.
Sponsors
Rep. Reed Gusciora [D] | Rep. Sean Kean [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-10-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 9 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 9 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-21 | Senate | Approved P.L.2016, c.65. |
2016-10-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (27-2) |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (59-9-9) |
2016-06-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4918 (Carry Over) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session