NJ A2558 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A260
Note: Carry Foward to future S434
Note: Carry Over of previous A2242
Note: Carry Foward to future S434
Note: Carry Over of previous A2242
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-17 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-17 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Vegetation Management Response Act"; concerns vegetation management related to electric public utility infrastructure.
Title
"Vegetation Management Response Act"; concerns vegetation management related to electric public utility infrastructure.
Sponsors
Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] | Rep. Harold Wirths [R] | Sen. Parker Space [R] | Rep. BettyLou DeCroce [R] |
Rep. Christopher DePhillips [R] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-20 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-20 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-12-17 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (70-1-5) |
2018-12-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-09-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2558 (Carry Over) 2019-01-17 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
A2558 (Carry Over) 2019-01-17 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
A2242 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
S2505 (Same As) 2018-12-17 - Senate Amendment (38-0) (Oroho)
A2558 (Carry Over) 2019-01-17 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
A2242 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
S2505 (Same As) 2018-12-17 - Senate Amendment (38-0) (Oroho)