NJ A2524 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1649
Note: Carry Foward to future A3720
Note: Carry Over of previous S601
Note: Carry Over of previous A2640
Note: Carry Foward to future A3720
Note: Carry Over of previous S601
Note: Carry Over of previous A2640
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-13 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-13 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates crime of fiscal victimization against senior citizens or disabled persons.
Title
Creates crime of fiscal victimization against senior citizens or disabled persons.
Sponsors
Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Shanique Speight [D] | Rep. Jay Webber [R] |
Rep. Daniel Benson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-10-13 - Assembly - Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2524 (Carry Over) 2022-10-13 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
A2524 (Carry Over) 2022-10-13 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S626 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S601 (Carry Over) 2020-01-30 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2640 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee
A2524 (Carry Over) 2022-10-13 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S626 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S601 (Carry Over) 2020-01-30 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2640 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee