NJ A2520 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3483
Note: Carry Over of previous S2590
Note: Carry Over of previous S2590
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
Pending: Assembly Women and Children Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
Pending: Assembly Women and Children Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts nursing mothers from jury duty.
Title
Exempts nursing mothers from jury duty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3483 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
S1815 (Same As) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S2590 (Carry Over) 2018-05-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S1815 (Same As) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S2590 (Carry Over) 2018-05-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A2520 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A3000/2520_I1.HTM |