NJ A2516 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2557
Note: Carry Foward to future S2125
Note: Carry Over of previous A4725
Note: Carry Foward to future S2125
Note: Carry Over of previous A4725
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-06 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-06 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides incentives for certain businesses associated with military installations.
Title
Provides incentives for certain businesses associated with military installations.
Sponsors
Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Rep. Cleopatra Tucker [D] | Sen. Robert Andrzejczak [D] |
Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Rep. R. Bruce Land [D] | Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-10-06 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-02-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2516 (Carry Over) 2016-10-06 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A2516 (Carry Over) 2016-10-06 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A4725 (Carry Over) 2015-11-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S2119 (Same As) 2016-05-02 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A2516 (Carry Over) 2016-10-06 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A4725 (Carry Over) 2015-11-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S2119 (Same As) 2016-05-02 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee