NJ A2507 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-22 - Approved P.L.2010, c.18.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-22 - Approved P.L.2010, c.18.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reduces 2010 minimum racing dates; makes various changes to breeders' awards during 2010; authorizes certain loans. *
Title
Reduces 2010 minimum racing dates; makes various changes to breeders' awards during 2010; authorizes certain loans. *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-22 | Approved P.L.2010, c.18. | |
2010-05-20 | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) | |
2010-05-20 | Substituted for S1811 (1R) | |
2010-05-20 | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading | |
2010-05-20 | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) | |
2010-05-06 | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-03-16 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulatory Oversight and Gaming Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1811 (Same As) 2010-05-20 - Substituted by A2507 (1R)