NJ A2505 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1167
Note: Carry Foward to future S1252
Note: Carry Over of previous A3163
Note: Carry Over of previous S1585
Note: Carry Foward to future S1252
Note: Carry Over of previous A3163
Note: Carry Over of previous S1585
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires local recreation departments and youth serving organizations to have defibrillators for youth athletic events.
Title
Requires local recreation departments and youth serving organizations to have defibrillators for youth athletic events.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2505 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
A2505 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
A3163 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
S1585 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S2001 (Same As) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A2505 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
A3163 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
S1585 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S2001 (Same As) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A2505 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A3000/2505_I1.HTM |