NJ A2503 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-11)
Status: Passed on October 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-06 - Approved P.L.2017, c.238.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Provides protections for individuals with developmental disabilities; upgrades crimes committed against such individuals; and improves tranparency and accountability in investigations of abuse, neglect, and exploitation of such individuals; designated as "Stephen Komninos' Law."*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides protections for individuals with developmental disabilities; upgrades crimes committed against such individuals; and improves tranparency and accountability in investigations of abuse, neglect, and exploitation of such individuals; designated as "Stephen Komninos' Law."*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-10-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S516 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-27 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-19 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-06AssemblyApproved P.L.2017, c.238.
2017-10-05AssemblyPassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-0)
2017-10-05AssemblyReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom.
2017-07-31SenatePassed by the Assembly (68-0-0)
2017-07-31Senate2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend.
2017-07-31SenateFirst Reading/Governor Recommendations Only
2017-07-31SenateConditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
2017-06-22AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0)
2017-06-22AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2017-06-19SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2017-06-19SenateSubstituted for S516 (1R)
2017-06-01SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2017-05-15SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2017-05-15SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading (without recommendation)
2017-01-09SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
2016-12-19AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
2016-10-27AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-09-19AssemblyReported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2016-02-04AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1109 (Carry Over) 2014-09-11 - Reported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S516 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - Substituted by A2503 (ACS/1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback