NJ A2477 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1220
Note: Carry Over of previous A4582
Note: Carry Over of previous A4582
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (54-13-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (54-13-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Drama Therapists and Dance/Movement Therapists Licensing Act."
Title
"Drama Therapists and Dance/Movement Therapists Licensing Act."
Sponsors
Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] |
Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Rep. Annette Chaparro [D] | Rep. Reed Gusciora [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (54-13-0) |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (32-3) |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2016-06-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (55-21-0) |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2477 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (54-13-0)
A4582 (Carry Over) 2015-06-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
S2159 (Same As) 2017-12-18 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A4582 (Carry Over) 2015-06-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
S2159 (Same As) 2017-12-18 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading