NJ A2454 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1345
Note: Carry Foward to future A2881
Note: Carry Over of previous S2221
Note: Carry Over of previous A2482
Note: Carry Foward to future A2881
Note: Carry Over of previous S2221
Note: Carry Over of previous A2482
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-19 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-19 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain electric public utilities to file emergency response plan with Board of Public Utilities.
Title
Requires certain electric public utilities to file emergency response plan with Board of Public Utilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-19 - Assembly - Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-19 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-03 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2454 (Carry Over) 2020-10-19 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A2454 (Carry Over) 2020-10-19 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S1300 (Same As) 2020-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S2221 (Carry Over) 2018-04-05 - Combined with S719/889 (SCS)
A2482 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
A2454 (Carry Over) 2020-10-19 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S1300 (Same As) 2020-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S2221 (Carry Over) 2018-04-05 - Combined with S719/889 (SCS)
A2482 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee