NJ A2442 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A5232

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Approved P.L.2019, c.18.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes reciprocity requirements for out-of-State certified nurse aides to practice in New Jersey.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes reciprocity requirements for out-of-State certified nurse aides to practice in New Jersey.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2679 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-31SenateApproved P.L.2019, c.18.
2018-12-17SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0)
2018-12-17SenateSubstituted for S2679 (2R)
2018-12-17SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2018-12-17AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (79-0-0)
2018-12-10AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-12-10AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-02-01AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5232 (Carry Over) 2017-12-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S2679 (Same As) 2018-12-17 - Substituted by A2442 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback