NJ A2439 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A1708
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Enrolled on January 5 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-05 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 5 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-05 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOT Commissioner to develop public awareness programs and use variable message signs to inform motorists about State's "move over" law.
Title
Requires DOT Commissioner to develop public awareness programs and use variable message signs to inform motorists about State's "move over" law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S3360 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-14 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-14 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-0) |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Substituted for S3360 (1R) |
2017-12-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-1-0) |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Vainieri Huttle) |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1708 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S3360 (Same As) 2018-01-05 - Substituted by A2439 (1R)
S3360 (Same As) 2018-01-05 - Substituted by A2439 (1R)