NJ A2431 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A2337

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-11 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires health insurers to limit patient cost-sharing and provide appeal process concerning certain prescription drug coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires health insurers to limit patient cost-sharing and provide appeal process concerning certain prescription drug coverage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-11AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-02-01AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2337 (Carry Over) 2016-10-06 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S1865 (Same As) 2018-02-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback