NJ A2418 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1747
Note: Carry Foward to future S329
Note: Carry Foward to future S329
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-13 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-13 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Prescription Drug Affordability Board; appropriates $1,000,000.
Title
Establishes Prescription Drug Affordability Board; appropriates $1,000,000.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
2020-02-03 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2418 (Carry Over) 2021-12-13 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A2418 (Carry Over) 2021-12-13 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S1066 (Same As) 2021-11-08 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2418 (Carry Over) 2021-12-13 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S1066 (Same As) 2021-11-08 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee