NJ A2386 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5514
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Firefighter Critical Mental Health Assistance Grant Program; appropriates $1 million.
Title
Establishes Firefighter Critical Mental Health Assistance Grant Program; appropriates $1 million.
Sponsors
Rep. William Spearman [D] | Rep. Sterley Stanley [D] | Rep. Reginald Atkins [D] | Rep. Joe Danielsen [D] |
Rep. Tennille McCoy [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Al Barlas [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5514 (Carry Over) 2023-06-05 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S2834 (Same As) 2024-02-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S2834 (Same As) 2024-02-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee