NJ A2376 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1261
Note: Carry Foward to future S4013
Note: Carry Over of previous S3966
Note: Carry Over of previous A5735
Note: Carry Foward to future S4013
Note: Carry Over of previous S3966
Note: Carry Over of previous A5735
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires municipality to provide free beach access to certain veterans.
Title
Requires municipality to provide free beach access to certain veterans.
Sponsors
Rep. Sterley Stanley [D] | Rep. Cleopatra Tucker [D] | Sen. Britnee Timberlake [D] | Rep. Ralph Caputo [D] |
Rep. Shanique Speight [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Aura Dunn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2376 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A2376 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S929 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3966 (Carry Over) 2019-06-20 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A5735 (Carry Over) 2019-08-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A2376 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S929 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3966 (Carry Over) 2019-06-20 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A5735 (Carry Over) 2019-08-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A2376 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A2500/2376_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A2500/2376_I2.HTM |