NJ A2368 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-09 - Approved P.L.2022, c.104.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-09 - Approved P.L.2022, c.104.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires schools to provide free school breakfasts and lunches to students from working class, middle-income families; designated as "Working Class Families' Anti-Hunger Act."
Title
Requires schools to provide free school breakfasts and lunches to students from working class, middle-income families; designated as "Working Class Families' Anti-Hunger Act."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1677 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1677 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-09 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2022, c.104. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-5-0) |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Substituted for S1677 (1R) |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-3-1) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2022-02-14 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2022-02-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Food Security Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1677 (Same As) 2022-06-29 - Substituted by A2368 (2R)