NJ A2365 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Passed on September 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-09 - Approved P.L.2022, c.103.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Passed on September 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-09 - Approved P.L.2022, c.103.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires school food authorities to engage in public education campaigns and develop promotional materials to educate parents and guardians of students about existing and expanding school meals program options.
Title
Requires school food authorities to engage in public education campaigns and develop promotional materials to educate parents and guardians of students about existing and expanding school meals program options.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1928 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1928 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-09 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2022, c.103. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-2-0) |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Substituted for S1928 (1R) |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2022-06-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-02-14 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2022-02-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Food Security Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1928 (Same As) 2022-06-29 - Substituted by A2365 (2R)