NJ A2363 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Approved P.L.2022, c.30.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Approved P.L.2022, c.30.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns SNAP services provided at county boards of social services; appropriates $250,000.
Title
Concerns SNAP services provided at county boards of social services; appropriates $250,000.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 70 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2033 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-06 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 70 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2033 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-06 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2022, c.30. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-7-1) |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-1) |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Substituted for S2033 (2R) |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (70-8-1) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
2022-02-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2022-02-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Food Security Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2033 (Same As) 2022-06-29 - Substituted by A2363 (3R)