NJ A2354 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S4058
Note: Carry Over of previous A6099
Note: Carry Over of previous A6099
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-25 - Substituted by S981 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-25 - Substituted by S981 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes procedures for seizure, care, and forfeiture of animals involved in animal cruelty violations.
Title
Establishes procedures for seizure, care, and forfeiture of animals involved in animal cruelty violations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Substituted by S981 (2R) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2022-02-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Food Security Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S981 (Same As) 2023-07-26 - Approved P.L.2023, c.129.
S4058 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Passed by the Senate (39-0)
A6099 (Carry Over) 2022-01-03 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S4058 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Passed by the Senate (39-0)
A6099 (Carry Over) 2022-01-03 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading