NJ A2329 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S875
Note: Carry Foward to future A2256
Note: Carry Foward to future A2201
Note: Carry Over of previous S3593
Note: Carry Over of previous A5219
Note: Carry Foward to future A2256
Note: Carry Foward to future A2201
Note: Carry Over of previous S3593
Note: Carry Over of previous A5219
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Division of Medical Assistance and Health Services in DHS to accept permanent change of station order for purposes of satisfying residency requirement for provision of home and community based services under certain circumstances.
Title
Requires Division of Medical Assistance and Health Services in DHS to accept permanent change of station order for purposes of satisfying residency requirement for provision of home and community based services under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2329 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A2329 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A2329 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S58 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S3593 (Carry Over) 2019-03-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A5219 (Carry Over) 2019-03-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
A2329 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A2329 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S58 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S3593 (Carry Over) 2019-03-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A5219 (Carry Over) 2019-03-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee