NJ A2288 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5199
Note: Carry Over of previous S3518
Note: Carry Over of previous S3518
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-13 - Approved P.L.2024, c.53.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-13 - Approved P.L.2024, c.53.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Office of Learning Equity and Academic Recovery in DOE.
Title
Establishes Office of Learning Equity and Academic Recovery in DOE.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2647 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2647 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-13 | Senate | Approved P.L.2024, c.53. |
2024-06-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) |
2024-06-28 | Senate | Substituted for S2647 (SCS) |
2024-06-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2024-06-28 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (65-10-0) |
2024-06-24 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2024-06-24 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5199 (Carry Over) 2023-02-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S3518 (Carry Over) 2023-01-26 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S2647 (Same As) 2024-06-28 - Substituted by A2288 (ACS)
S3518 (Carry Over) 2023-01-26 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S2647 (Same As) 2024-06-28 - Substituted by A2288 (ACS)