NJ A2285 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A6146
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-12 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-12 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes process for formation of professional limited liability companies.
Title
Establishes process for formation of professional limited liability companies.
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Freiman [D] | Sen. Britnee Timberlake [D] | Rep. Sterley Stanley [D] | Rep. Robert Auth [R] |
Rep. DeAnne DeFuccio [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2022-03-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-02-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A6146 (Carry Over) 2022-01-06 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading