NJ A2256 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3083
Note: Carry Over of previous A4673
Note: Carry Over of previous A4673
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-30 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-30 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the New Jersey Film and Television Project and Employment Incentive Program.
Title
Establishes the New Jersey Film and Television Project and Employment Incentive Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-27 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-27 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-30 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-10-27 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2256 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A4673 (Carry Over) 2015-06-29 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S2553 (Same As) 2016-09-26 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A4673 (Carry Over) 2015-06-29 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S2553 (Same As) 2016-09-26 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee