NJ A225 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1947
Note: Carry Over of previous A102
Note: Carry Over of previous S2130
Note: Carry Over of previous A102
Note: Carry Over of previous S2130
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Pending: Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Pending: Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides tax credit under corporation business tax and gross income tax for certain costs incurred in purchase and installation of certain environmentally responsible business equipment.
Title
Provides tax credit under corporation business tax and gross income tax for certain costs incurred in purchase and installation of certain environmentally responsible business equipment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A225 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
A102 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S1900 (Same As) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S2130 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A102 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S1900 (Same As) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S2130 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A225 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A0500/225_I1.HTM |