NJ A2210 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous S3608

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-30 - Substituted by S249 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Implements certain guidelines concerning purchase of catalytic converters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Implements certain guidelines concerning purchase of catalytic converters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-30AssemblySubstituted by S249 (1R)
2023-03-23AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2023-03-23AssemblyRecommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2022-12-05AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2022-12-05AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
2022-02-07AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee

Same As/Similar To

S249 (Same As) 2023-05-15 - Approved P.L.2023, c.56.
S3608 (Carry Over) 2021-06-17 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback