NJ A2189 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Senate Amendment (29-0) (Ruiz)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires school districts to include instruction on consequences of distributing and soliciting sexually explicit images through electronic means as part of New Jersey Student Learning Standards in Comprehensive Health and Physical Education. *

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires school districts to include instruction on consequences of distributing and soliciting sexually explicit images through electronic means as part of New Jersey Student Learning Standards in Comprehensive Health and Physical Education. *

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-07SenateSenate Amendment (29-0) (Ruiz)
2018-05-14SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-22SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
2018-02-15AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (73-0-0)
2018-02-12AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-08AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2092 (Same As) 2018-06-07 - Senate Amendment (29-0) (Ruiz)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback