NJ A2183 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A783

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

"Music Therapist Licensing Act."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Music Therapist Licensing Act."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 13 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-12SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
2018-04-12AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (59-13-0)
2018-01-29AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-29AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee

Same As/Similar To

A783 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (62-5-0)
S1687 (Same As) 2018-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback