NJ A2182 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A2523

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on December 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-17 - Approved P.L.2018, c.155.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes an apprenticeship requirement to qualify for an electrical contractor's license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes an apprenticeship requirement to qualify for an electrical contractor's license.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2765 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 7 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-17SenateApproved P.L.2018, c.155.
2018-10-29SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-5)
2018-10-29SenateSubstituted for S2765
2018-10-15SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-22SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
2018-02-15AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (65-7-0)
2018-01-29AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-29AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2523 (Carry Over) 2018-01-05 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (28-1)
S2765 (Same As) 2018-10-29 - Substituted by A2182

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback