NJ A2164 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Approved P.L.2019, c.15.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

"Healthy Small Food Retailer Act." *

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Healthy Small Food Retailer Act." *

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 61 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1312 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-31AssemblyApproved P.L.2019, c.15.
2018-12-17AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (61-16-1)
2018-10-29AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2018-10-29SenatePassed by the Senate (38-1)
2018-10-29SenateSubstituted for S1312 (SCS/1R)
2018-10-22SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-06-14SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-06-14SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-07SenateTransferred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
2018-04-05SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
2018-03-26AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (59-17-0)
2018-03-12AssemblyReported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2018-01-29AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1312 (Same As) 2018-10-29 - Substituted by A2164 (ACS/1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback