NJ A2160 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3179
Note: Carry Foward to future S426
Note: Carry Over of previous S481
Note: Carry Foward to future S426
Note: Carry Over of previous S481
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-17 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-17 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises definition of "landlord" to include rooming and boarding house owners and operators with regard to ordinances holding landlords to certain standards of responsibility.
Title
Revises definition of "landlord" to include rooming and boarding house owners and operators with regard to ordinances holding landlords to certain standards of responsibility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2160 (Carry Over) 2019-01-17 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A2160 (Carry Over) 2019-01-17 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S531 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S481 (Carry Over) 2017-06-01 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
A2160 (Carry Over) 2019-01-17 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S531 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S481 (Carry Over) 2017-06-01 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee